EP0444671 - Process for the production of propylene polymer films and laminates and products thus obtained [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONTELL NORTH AMERICA INC. 2801 Centerville Road New Castle County Delaware / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states MONTELL NORTH AMERICA INC. 2801 Centerville Road New Castle County Delaware / US | ||
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states Himont Incorporated 2801 Centerville Road New Castle County Delaware / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lesca, Guiseppe 9, Via Parini I-20121 Milano / IT | 02 /
Giannella, Vincenzo, Dr.-Chem. 32, Via Moretto da Brescia I-20133 Milano / IT | 03 /
Ongari, Serafino 209, corso Europa I-20017 Rho, Milano / IT | 04 /
Vezzoli, Annibale 1/A Via Piave I-22060 Carugo, Como / IT | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Zumstein jun., Fritz, et al Patentanwälte Dr. F. Zumstein Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Bräuhausstrasse 4 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | Zumstein, Fritz, Dr., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91103014.6 | 28.02.1991 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | IT19900019511 | 28.02.1990 Original published format: IT 1951190 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0444671 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0444671 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0444671 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08F297/08, B32B27/32 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
C08F297/08 (KR);
B32B27/08 (US);
C08F297/086 (EP,US);
B32B2323/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Propylenpolymerfilmen und Verbundstoffen und Produkte davon | [1991/36] | English: | Process for the production of propylene polymer films and laminates and products thus obtained | [1991/36] | French: | Procédé de préparation de films de polypropylène et laminés et produits obtenus à partir de ceux-ci | [1991/36] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/21] | 10.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP55118910 ; | [A]JP59149909 ; | [A]JP59149910 ; | [A]EP0077532 (MONTEDISON SPA [IT]); | [A]EP0086300 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [Y]EP0145368 (TOA NENRYO KOGYO KK [JP]); | [A]EP0170255 (HIMONT INC [US]) | [Y] - DATABASE_WPI, NØ80-76157C, Derwent Publications & JP-A-55118910 (MITSUI PETRO, & JP55118910 A 00000000 | [A] - DATABASE WPIL, NØ84-247421, Derwent Publications & JP-A-59149909 (MITSUI PETRO, & JP59149909 A 00000000 | [A] - DATABASE WPIL, NØ84-247422, Derwent Publications & JP-A-59149910 (MITSUI PETRO, & JP59149910 A 00000000 |