EP0447859 - Electric cooking plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.G.O. Elektro-Geräte Blanc u. Fischer Rote-Tor-Strasse D-75038 Oberderdingen / DE | [1991/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schreder, Felix Uhlandstrasse 8/1 W-7519 Oberderdingen / DE | [1991/39] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1991/39] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Neckarstrasse 50 D-70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91103086.4 | 01.03.1991 | [1991/39] | Priority number, date | DE19904008830 | 20.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4008830 | [1991/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0447859 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0447859 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/10 | [1991/39] | CPC: |
F24C15/104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, SE [1991/39] | Title | German: | Elektrokochplatte | [1991/39] | English: | Electric cooking plate | [1991/39] | French: | Plaque de cuisson électrique | [1991/39] | File destroyed: | 17.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 11.08.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3246123 (EDWARD AMMERMAN GEORGE, et al); | [X]EP0113923 (EGO ELEKTRO BLANC & FISCHER [DE]) |