EP0446725 - Base resistant fluoroelastomers with improved processibility and curability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1997 [1997/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carlson, Dana Peter 13 Brook Lane Chadds Ford, Pennsylvania 19317 / US | [1991/38] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91103109.4 | 01.03.1991 | [1991/38] | Priority number, date | US19900488094 | 01.03.1990 Original published format: US 488094 | [1991/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0446725 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0446725 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08F214/26, C08F2/38, // (C08F214/26, 210:06),(C08F214/26, 210:06, 214:22),(C08F214/26, 210:00, 216:14) | [1991/38] | CPC: |
C08F214/265 (EP,US);
C08F210/06 (EP,US);
C08K7/14 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K7/14, C08L53/00 (EP,US);
C08F210/06, C08F214/26, C08F2500/17 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/38] | Title | German: | Basenbeständige Fluorelastomere mit verbesserter Verarbeitbarkeit und Härtbarkeit | [1991/38] | English: | Base resistant fluoroelastomers with improved processibility and curability | [1991/38] | French: | Fluoro-élastomères résistant à la base ayant une transformabilité et curabilité améliorée | [1991/38] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/21] | 09.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0027721 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]); | [X]EP0208314 (DU PONT [US]) |