EP0446776 - Sealing profile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HPP PROFILE GmbH Liliencronstrasse 65 21629 Neu Wulmstorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states HPP PROFILE GmbH Liliencronstrasse 65 D-21629 Neu Wulmstorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Wilfried Königsdamm 36 W-2150 Buxtehude / DE | [1991/38] | Representative(s) | Heim, Hans-Karl, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | Heim, Hans-Karl, Dipl.-Ing., et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Irmgardstrasse 3 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91103436.1 | 06.03.1991 | [1991/38] | Priority number, date | DE19904006983 | 06.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4006983 | [1991/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0446776 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0446776 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0446776 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/62, E06B7/22, E06B7/23, B60J10/02 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
E06B7/2305 (EP);
E06B3/62 (EP);
E06B7/2303 (EP);
E06B7/2309 (EP);
E06B7/2314 (EP);
E06B2003/6223 (EP);
E06B2003/6229 (EP);
E06B2003/6264 (EP);
E06B2003/6273 (EP);
E06B2003/6285 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1991/38] | E06B7/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/38] | Title | German: | Dichtungsprofil | [1991/38] | English: | Sealing profile | [1991/38] | French: | Joint d'étanchéité profilé | [1991/38] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 04.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 29.06.1994 | GR | 29.06.1994 | AT | 06.03.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/05] | GR | 29.06.1994 | |
AT | 06.03.1995 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 06.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1129273 (PAWLING RUBBER CORP); | [AD]US3061895 (KLEINHANS HERBERT F); | [A]DE8131774U ; | [A]DE3048744 (METZELER KAUTSCHUK [DE]); | [A]DE3415347 (HUBER & SUHNER AG [CH]); | [A]GB2140068 (DRAFTEX IND LTD); | [A]DE8534283U ; | [A]EP0249182 (PIRELLI REIFENWERKE [DE]); | [A]DE3706503 (DEVENTER PROFILE [DE]) |