EP0446780 - Toe piece binding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1994 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states silvretta-sherpas Sportartikel GmbH Münchner Strasse 80 85757 Karlsfeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | For all designated states silvretta-sherpas Sportartikel GmbH Münchner Strasse 80 D-85757 Karlsfeld / DE | ||
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states SILVRETTA - SHERPAS SPORTARTIKEL GmbH & Co. KG Münchner Strasse 80 D-8047 Karlsfeld/Rothschwaige / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burger, Simon Münchner Strasse 66 W-8047 Karlsfeld / DE | 02 /
Eugler, Norbert Wacholderweg 38 W-8047 Karlsfeld / DE | [1991/38] | Representative(s) | Zmyj, Erwin Reismühlenstrasse 41 81477 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | Zmyj, Erwin, Dipl.-Ing., Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing. Rosenheimer Strasse 52/II D-81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91103461.9 | 07.03.1991 | [1991/38] | Priority number, date | DE19904007667 | 10.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4007667 | [1991/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0446780 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0446780 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0446780 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A63C9/00 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
A63C9/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/38] | A63C9/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, IT, LI [1991/38] | Title | German: | Vordere Sohlenhaltevorrichtung | [1991/38] | English: | Toe piece binding | [1991/38] | French: | Fixation de la butée avant | [1991/38] | Examination procedure | 28.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 26.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.04.1991 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   18.04.1991 | 07.04.1991 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   18.04.1991 | 07.04.1991 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   18.04.1991 | 07.04.1991 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   18.04.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3003777 (HILDING ANDERSON C); | [A]US3979132 (ISER-ISER HERBERT); | [A]CH622432 (GOERLACH HANS [DE]); | [A]EP0035613 (FORD HOWARD); | [AD]EP0152629 (WUNDER GMBH CO KG HEINRICH [DE]) |