EP0445809 - Device for measuring blood pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Müller & Sebastiani Elektronik-GmbH Heiglhofstrasse 1 81377 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states Müller & Sebastiani Elektronik-GmbH Heiglhofstrasse 1 D-81377 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Peter Georgenstrasse 126 W-8000 München 40 / DE | 02 /
Sebastiani, Oscar Klenzestrasse 81 W-8000 München 5 / DE | 03 /
Graf von Arnim, Thomas, Dr. Schwedenstrasse 33 W-8000 München 40 / DE | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/37] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys.) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91103489.0 | 07.03.1991 | [1991/37] | Priority number, date | DE19904007400 | 08.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4007400 | DE19904012874 | 23.04.1990 Original published format: DE 4012874 | [1991/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0445809 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0445809 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0445809 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/022, A61B5/0432, A61B5/0205, A61B5/0404 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
A61B5/0205 (EP);
A61B5/022 (EP);
A61B5/02455 (EP);
A61B5/7285 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/37] | A61B5/022, A61B5/0432 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/37] | Title | German: | Blutdruckmessvorrichtung | [1991/37] | English: | Device for measuring blood pressure | [1991/37] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de la pression sanguine | [1991/37] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 21.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.07.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4860759 ; | [Y]GB2054861 ; | [A]EP0123313 ; | [A]US4889132 ; | [A]EP0029349 ; | [A]US4617937 ; | [A]US4905706 |