EP0446788 - System for temperature determination and calibration in a biomedical thermometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IVAC CORPORATION 10300 Campus Pt. Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [1991/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldberg, Jack 8332 Morning Mist Court San Diego, CA 92215 / US | 02 /
Rosati, Robert J. 7749 Palacio Drive Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | [1991/38] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91103502.0 | 07.03.1991 | [1991/38] | Priority number, date | US19900492655 | 12.03.1990 Original published format: US 492655 | [1991/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0446788 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0446788 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/16 | [1991/38] | CPC: |
G01J5/04 (EP);
G01J5/026 (EP,US);
G01J5/02 (EP);
G01J5/049 (EP);
G01J5/05 (US);
G01J5/064 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1991/38] | Title | German: | System zur Temperaturbestimmung und Kalibrierung in einem biomedizinischen Thermometer | [1991/38] | English: | System for temperature determination and calibration in a biomedical thermometer | [1991/38] | French: | Système pour déterminer la température et pour la calibration dans un thermomètre biomédical | [1991/38] | Examination procedure | 31.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 08.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4456390 (JUNKERT KENNETH G [US], et al); | [X]US4634294 (CHRISTOL JAMES T [US], et al); | [A]US4722612 (JUNKERT KENNETH G [US], et al); | [X]US4784149 (BERMAN HERBERT L [US], et al); | [X]US4790324 (O'HARA GARY J [US], et al); | [A]US4797840 (FRADEN JACOB [US]) | Examination | US4403296 | EP0178368 | EP0337724 | - Thermometrics catalogue |