EP0445821 - Process for preparing a 3-formylcephem derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otsuka Kagaku Kabushiki Kaisha 2-27, Otedori 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 540 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states OTSUKA KAGAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-27, Ote-dori 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 540 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Torii, Sigeru 4-18, Sanyo-danchi 4-chome, Sanyo-cho Akaiwa-gun, Okayama-ken / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Hideo 5115-34, Haga Okayama-shi, Okayama-ken / JP | 03 /
Taniguchi, Masatoshi, Otsuka Kagaku KK Tokushima Lab., 463, Kagasuno, Kawauchi-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima-ken / JP | 04 /
Sasaoka, Michio, c/o Otsuka Kagaku KK Tokushima Lab., 463, Kagasuno, Kawauchi-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima-ken / JP | 05 /
Shiroi, Takashi, c/o Otsuka Kagaku KK Tokushima Lab., 463, Kagasuno, Kawauchi-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima-ken / JP | 06 /
Kikuchi, Ryo, c/o Otsuka Kagaku KK Tokushima Lab., 463, Kagasuno, Kawauchi-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima-ken / JP | 07 /
Kameyama, Yutaka, c/o Otsuka Kagaku KK Tokushima Lab., 463, Kagasuno, Kawauchi-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima-ken / JP | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 D-80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/37] | Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold, Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert, Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91103514.5 | 07.03.1991 | [1991/37] | Priority number, date | JP19900056955 | 08.03.1990 Original published format: JP 5695590 | [1991/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445821 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0445821 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D501/04, C07D501/26 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
C07D501/00 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1991/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines 3-Formylcephem-Derivats | [1991/37] | English: | Process for preparing a 3-formylcephem derivative | [1991/37] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'un dérivé de 3-formyl-céphem | [1991/37] | Examination procedure | 21.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 27.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP51122087 ; | [A]JP5071691 ; | [A]CH556876 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [A]US3950329 (BOSWELL JR GEORGE ALBERT, et al); | [A]EP0103264 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) | [L] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 114, no. 19, 13 May 1991 Columbus, Ohio, USA H. TANAKA et al.: "A facile access to 3-formyl-3-cephems through oxygen or air oxidation of 3-iodomethyl-3-cephems" page 748; ref. no. 18508& Synlett 1990, [11], 660-2 [cat. P,X] | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 87, no. 1, 04 July 1977 Columbus, Ohio, USA page 487; ref. no. 5991E & JP-A-51-122087 [cat. D], & JP51122087 A 19770704 | [AD] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 10, no. 5, 1967, pages 966 - 968; J.W. CHAMBERLIN et al.: "Chemistry of Cephalosporin Antibiotics. X. Synthesis of Methyl 3-Formyl-7-[thiophene-2-acet amido]-3-cephem-4-carboxylate, a New ..." | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 83, no. 13, 29 September 1975 Columbus, Ohio, USA page 564; ref. no. 114445T & JP-A-50-71691 [cat. D], & JP5071691 A 19750929 | [AD] - CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, vol. 28, no. 4, 1980, pages 1339 - 1341; T. SUGAWARA et al.: "A New Synthetic Method of 3-Formylcephalosporins" |