EP0446794 - Method for in-situ monitoring of superficial humidity of moving coffee beans [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KERNFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM KARLSRUHE GMBH Postfach 36 40 D-76021 Karlsruhe / DE | For all designated states Probat-Werke von Gimborn GmbH & Co. KG Reeser Strasse 94 46446 Emmerich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | For all designated states KERNFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM KARLSRUHE GMBH Postfach 36 40 D-76021 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
For all designated states Probat-Werke von Gimborn GmbH & Co. KG Reeser Strasse 94 D-46446 Emmerich / DE | |||
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states KERNFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM KARLSRUHE GMBH Postfach 36 40 D-76050 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
For all designated states Probat-Werke von Gimborn GmbH & Co. KG Reeser Strasse 94 D-46446 Emmerich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rapp, Wilhelm Im Jüden 44a W-7520 Bruchsal 4 / DE | [1991/38] | Application number, filing date | 91103540.0 | 08.03.1991 | [1991/38] | Priority number, date | DE19904008279 | 15.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4008279 | [1991/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0446794 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0446794 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/85, G01N21/31 | [1991/38] | CPC: |
G01N21/3554 (EP);
G01N2021/8592 (EP);
G01N21/314 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur in-situ-Überwachung der Oberflächenfeuchte von bewegten Kaffeebohnen | [1991/38] | English: | Method for in-situ monitoring of superficial humidity of moving coffee beans | [1991/38] | French: | Procédé de surveillance en site de l'humidité superficielle de grains de café en déplacement | [1991/38] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 27.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3720388 ; | [AD]US4097743 ; | [A]DE3540751 ; | [AD]DE3601931 |