EP0446808 - Method and apparatus for measuring the colour of fibre slivers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2008/39] |
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderegg, Peter Mythenstrasse 28 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
Moser, Robert Wingertlistrasse 41 CH-8405 Winterthur / CH | 03 /
Faas, Jürg Seuzacherstrasse 16 CH-8474 Dinhard / CH | [1991/38] | Application number, filing date | 91103587.1 | 08.03.1991 | [1991/38] | Priority number, date | CH19900000786 | 12.03.1990 Original published format: CH 78690 | CH19900001319 | 19.04.1990 Original published format: CH 131990 | [1991/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0446808 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0446808 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0446808 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/46, G01N21/86, G01N33/36 | [1991/38] | CPC: |
G01N21/4738 (EP,US);
G01N2021/4769 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Messung der Eigenfarbe von Faserbändern | [1991/38] | English: | Method and apparatus for measuring the colour of fibre slivers | [1991/38] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour mesurer la couleur des mèches de fibres | [1991/38] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 09.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/15] | Request for further processing for: | 02.07.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.07.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.04.1995 | ES | 19.04.1995 | FR | 19.04.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | BE | 19.04.1995 | |
ES | 19.04.1995 | ||
FR | 15.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/05] | BE | 19.04.1995 | |
FR | 15.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | FR | 15.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5858442 ; | [A]DE956613 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]US3336481 (NELSON RICHARD B); | [A]US3496366 (HUNZIKER WALTER EMIL, et al); | [A]US3729375 (CHAPPELLE J); | [A]GB2020423 (ZELLWEGER USTER AG); | [A]US4194840 (GRACOVETSKY SERGE [CA], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 146 (P-206)(1291) 25. Juni 1983 & JP-A-58 58 442 ( FUJI DENKI SEIZO ) 7. April 1983, & JP5858442 A 00000000 |