EP0447897 - Dry plasma product and process for the production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.1994 [1994/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasutoshi, Takeichi 4845-4-222, Ami, Ami-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki / JP | 02 /
Iwao, Satou 2120-11, Higashiohhashi Ishioka-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 03 /
Yoshinobu, Kaji 2981-10, Honmachida Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Katsuya, Nasu 4-5-9, Mizukino, Moriya-machi Kitasouma-gun, Ibaraki / JP | [1991/39] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91103616.8 | 08.03.1991 | [1991/39] | Priority number, date | JP19900059668 | 09.03.1990 Original published format: JP 5966890 | [1991/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0447897 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0447897 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/16, A23L1/305, A23J3/12 | [1991/39] | CPC: |
A23J3/12 (EP);
A23L13/424 (EP);
A23L33/17 (EP);
A61K35/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/39] | Title | German: | Trockenplasmaprodukt und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1991/39] | English: | Dry plasma product and process for the production thereof | [1991/39] | French: | Produit de plasma sec et procédé de préparation | [1991/39] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/30] | 17.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/48] | 05.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP59088042 [ ]; | [X]BE817708 ; | [A]CA1195871 (LEGER PIERRE PAUL) | [ ] - WPIL DERWENT, accession no. 84-162421 [26], Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP,A,59 088 042 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND. K.K.) 21-05-1984, abstract., & JP59088042 A 00000000 |