EP0446900 - Mixed-flow compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishida, Hideo 1977-13, Shimoinayoshi, Chiyodamura Niihari-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Hiromi 3186-21, Shimoinayoshi, Chiyodamura Niihari-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Miura, Haruo 1771-2, Niihari, Chiyodamura Niihari-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 04 /
Takagi, Takeo 85-23, Shoei Tsukuba-shi / JP | [1991/38] | Representative(s) | Finck, Dieter, et al V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 2-3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | Finck, Dieter, Dr.Ing., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 - 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91103850.3 | 13.03.1991 | [1991/38] | Priority number, date | JP19900060973 | 14.03.1990 Original published format: JP 6097390 | [1991/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0446900 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0446900 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/44, F04D17/06, F04D29/62 | [1991/38] | CPC: |
F04D17/06 (EP);
F04D29/444 (EP);
F04D29/624 (EP);
F05D2250/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1991/38] | Title | German: | Diagonal-Verdichter | [1991/38] | English: | Mixed-flow compressor | [1991/38] | French: | Compresseur à écoulement mixte | [1991/38] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 05.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5629099 ; | [A]US4850795 ; | [A]EP0201912 ; | [A]US4900225 ; | [A]GB693727 | [A] - COMPRESSED AIR MAGAZINE,Vol.9,September 1985 Washington,USA. "The X-Flo Compressor-A Machine Whose Time Has Come." Page 30-34.*the whole document | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 80 (M-70)(752) 26 May 1981, & JP-A-56 29099 (HITACHI) 23 March 1981,, & JP5629099 A 19810323 |