EP0448006 - Process for the preparation of acylales [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hertzsch, Winfried, Dr. Steinauerstrasse 33 W-6000 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
Jähne, Gerhard, Dr. Johannesallee 14 W-6230 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1991/39] | Application number, filing date | 91104127.5 | 18.03.1991 | [1991/39] | Priority number, date | DE19904008856 | 20.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4008856 | [1991/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0448006 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0448006 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0448006 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/14, C07C67/08 | [1991/39] | CPC: |
C07C67/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/08, C07C69/003 (EP,US);
C07C67/08, C07C69/157 (EP,US);
C07C67/08, C07C69/16 (US,EP);
C07C67/08, C07C69/63 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Acylalen | [1991/39] | English: | Process for the preparation of acylales | [1991/39] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'acylales | [1991/39] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/44] | 03.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB830850 (DISTILLERS CO YEAST LTD) | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 111, Nr. 7, 14 August 1989, Columbus, Ohio, USA, O. ANTONSEN et al., "Synthesis of sulfinylmethylethers and conversion of these into halomethyl and acyloxymethyl ethers", Seite 707, abstract-no. 57 186e; & Acta Chem. Scand., Ser. B, 1988, vol. B42, no. 8, pages 515-523 (Eng). |