EP0478879 - A system of interconnecting electrical elements having differing bonding requirements for mounting said elements to a printed circuit board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/15] | Secondary board for mounting of components having differing bonding requirements | ||
[1994/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.1995 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Cheng-Cheng 3365 St. Michael Drive Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
Hanlon, Lawrence 287 Oak Hurst Place Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Georg-Kalb-Strasse 9 D-82049 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 91104477.4 | 21.03.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | US19900590893 | 01.10.1990 Original published format: US 590893 | [1992/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0478879 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0478879 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0478879 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/36, H01L23/538 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
H01L23/5385 (EP,US);
H01L23/04 (EP,US);
H01L23/5384 (EP,US);
H05K3/363 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H05K1/141 (EP,US);
H05K2201/096 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10666 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/15] | Title | German: | System für das Zusammenschalten elektrischer Komponenten mit verschiedenen Verbindungserfordernissen zum Montieren der Komponenten auf Leiterplatten | [1994/42] | English: | A system of interconnecting electrical elements having differing bonding requirements for mounting said elements to a printed circuit board | [1994/42] | French: | System d'interconnection des éléments électriques ayant des exigences de liaison différentes pour leur montage sur un plaquette imprimée | [1994/42] |
Former [1992/15] | Sekundäre Leiterplatte zum Montieren von Komponenten mit verschiedenen Verbindungserfordernissen | ||
Former [1992/15] | Secondary board for mounting of components having differing bonding requirements | ||
Former [1992/15] | Plaquette secondaire pour le montage de composants ayant des exigences de liaison différentes | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 23.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/08] | 21.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1136753 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC COMPUTERS LTD); | [A]US3888639 (HASTINGS MYRON L, et al); | [A]DE3328547 (HAGENUK TELECOM GMBH) |