EP0456994 - Drill shaft for boring the taphole of a blast furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WILLI WADER GMBH Justus-von-Liebig-Strasse 3 D-42477 Radevormwald / DE | [1991/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wader, Jochen Vorm Holte 10 W-5608 Radevormwald / DE | [1991/47] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Postfach 13 01 13 42028 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Postfach 13 01 13 42028 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1991/47] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Postfach 13 01 13 D-42028 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 91104490.7 | 22.03.1991 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | DE19900005494U | 15.05.1990 Original published format: DE 9005494 U | DE19900014836U | 26.10.1990 Original published format: DE 9014836 U | [1991/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0456994 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C21B7/12, E21B10/42, E21B10/48 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
B23B27/18 (EP,US);
C21B7/12 (EP);
E21B10/485 (EP);
F27D3/1527 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/47] | Title | German: | Bohrstange zum Stichlochbohren an Hochöfen | [1991/47] | English: | Drill shaft for boring the taphole of a blast furnace | [1991/47] | French: | Tige de perçage pour trou de coulée d'un haut fourneau | [1991/47] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 17.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 03.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR332541 (ADAM TINDEL [US]); | [A]US3127945 (BRIDWELL HAROLD C, et al); | [A]BE895116 (BERGHE RENE VAN DEN); | [A]US4681174 (AUBAKIROV MARAT T [SU], et al); | [A]GB2187774 (SOLETANCHE); | [AD]DE8901643U ; | [A]EP0351699 (HILTI AG [LI]) |