EP0453772 - Doctor blade inking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomas, John Oskar-von-Miller-Strasse 83 W-8900 Augsburg 22 / DE | [1994/22] |
Former [1991/44] | 01 /
Thomas, John, Dr. Oskar-von-Miller-Strasse 83 W-8900 Augsburg 22 / DE | Application number, filing date | 91104494.9 | 22.03.1991 | [1991/44] | Priority number, date | DE19904012618 | 20.04.1990 Original published format: DE 4012618 | [1991/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0453772 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0453772 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/02, B41F31/06 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
B41F31/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/44] | Title | German: | Rakelfarbwerk | [1991/44] | English: | Doctor blade inking device | [1991/44] | French: | Dispositif d'encrage à racle | [1991/44] | Examination procedure | 18.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 26.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.03.1995
17.03.1995
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer-Albert Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [1996/35] |
Former [1995/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.03.1995
Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 D-97080 Würzburg / DE | 07.04.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.08.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 28.11.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.12.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 03.05.2001 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/29] | Appeal following opposition | 14.02.1997 | Appeal received No. T0185/97 | 11.04.1997 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.11.1999 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1999/47] | 28.03.2000 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2000/14] | 20.04.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3832183 ; | [A]DE3832148 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) |