EP0453776 - Switchgear with a circuit breaker or a load break switch and a fuse [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEG Sachsenwerk GmbH Einhauser Strasse 9 D-93053 Regensburg / DE | [1992/33] |
Former [1991/44] | For all designated states Sachsenwerk Aktiengesellschaft Einhauser Strasse 9 D-93053 Regensburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stegmüller, Karl, Dipl.-Ing. Galgenberg-West 11 W-8401 Wiesent / DE | [1991/44] | Representative(s) | Breiter, Achim EHG Elektroholding GmbH Patente Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | Breiter, Achim, Dipl.-Ing. AEG Aktiengesellschaft Patent- und Lizenzwesen Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60591 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 91104524.3 | 22.03.1991 | [1991/44] | Priority number, date | DE19904012173 | 14.04.1990 Original published format: DE 4012173 | DE19904023237 | 21.07.1990 Original published format: DE 4023237 | [1991/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0453776 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0453776 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01H73/34, H02H7/22, H01H85/46 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
H02H7/222 (EP);
H01H9/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/44] | Title | German: | Schalteinrichtung mit einem Lastschalter oder Lasttrennschalter und einer Sicherung | [1991/44] | English: | Switchgear with a circuit breaker or a load break switch and a fuse | [1991/44] | French: | Mécanisme de couplage avec disjoncteur ou sectionneur de charge et fusible | [1991/44] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/19] | 09.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1050430 ; | [A]CH311386 (FKG AG [CH]); | [X]US3309478 (KIESEL GEORGE W, et al); | [A]DE3213090 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) |