Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] |
24.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1994 [1994/46] |
08.10.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.11.1993 [1993/47] |
21.01.1993 | First examination report | |
29.08.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.10.1991 [1991/42] |
15.08.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.10.1991 [1991/40] |