EP0449206 - Clamping circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakagawara, Chikashi 2-42-2-3-625 Tennocyo, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 240 / JP | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91104768.6 | 26.03.1991 | [1991/40] | Priority number, date | JP19900086192 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: JP 8619290 | [1991/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0449206 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0449206 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0449206 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/16 | [1991/40] | CPC: |
H04N9/72 (EP,KR,US);
H04N9/67 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/40] | Title | German: | Klemmschaltung | [1991/40] | English: | Clamping circuit | [1991/40] | French: | Circuit de verrouillage | [1991/40] | Examination procedure | 26.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/40] | 30.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4204221 (SHANLEY ROBERT L II [US]); | [A]DE3115553 (RCA CORP [US]); | [A]US4554577 (SHANLEY II ROBERT L [US], et al); | [X]EP0280123 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) |