EP0449218 - Semiconductor memory device having signal receiving facility fabricated from BI-CMOS circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.1997 [1997/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimogawa, Kenjyu, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91104791.8 | 26.03.1991 | [1991/40] | Priority number, date | JP19900082683 | 29.03.1990 Original published format: JP 8268390 | [1991/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0449218 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0449218 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0449218 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11C5/14, G11C11/418 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
G11C11/418 (EP,US);
G11C5/143 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/40] | G11C11/418 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/40] | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeicheranordnung hergestellt mit BICMOS-Schaltungen und fähig, ein Signal zu empfangen | [1991/40] | English: | Semiconductor memory device having signal receiving facility fabricated from BI-CMOS circuits | [1991/40] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire à semi-conducteurs fabriqué avec des circuits BI-CMOS avec facilité de réception de signal | [1991/40] | Examination procedure | 26.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/40] | 08.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5651090 ; | [A]JP5794984 ; | [A]JP5310229 | [Y] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS. vol. 23, no. 5, October 1988, NEW YORK US pages 1048 - 1053 KERTIS ET AL 'A 12-ns ECL I/O 256Kx1-bit SRAM using a 1-um BiCMOS Technology' | [Y] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS. vol. 21, no. 5, October 1986, NEW YORK US pages 692 - 703 FLANNAGAN ET AL 'Two 13-ns 64K CMOS SRAMs with Very Low Active Power and Improved Asynchronous Circuit Techniques' | [A] - IEEE INTERNATIONAL SOLID STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE. vol. 37, 15 February 1990, NEW YORK US pages 138 - 139 TAKADA ET AL 'A 5ns 1Mb ECL BiCMOS SRAM' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 107 (P-70)(779) 11 July 1981 & JP-A-56 51 090 ( TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI ) 8 May 1981, & JP5651090 A 19810508 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 179 (P-142)(1057) 14 September 1982 & JP-A-57 94 984 ( SANYO DENKI KK ) 12 June 1982, & JP5794984 A 19820612 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2, no. 45 (E-24)27 March 1978 & JP-A-53 10 229 ( MITSUBISHI DENKI KK ) 30 January 1978, & JP5310229 A 19780130 |