EP0449227 - Sputtering apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.1996 [1996/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Jiro c/o SONY CORPORATION, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/40] | Patentanwälte TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91104804.9 | 26.03.1991 | [1991/40] | Priority number, date | JP19900083793 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: JP 8379390 | JP19900083795 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: JP 8379590 | [1991/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0449227 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0449227 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0449227 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/56, C23C14/34, C23C14/50, G11B7/26 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
G11B7/26 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/56 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/40] | C23C14/34, C23C14/56, C23C14/50, G11B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1991/40] | Title | German: | Sputteranlage | [1991/40] | English: | Sputtering apparatus | [1991/40] | French: | Appareillage de pulvérisation cathodique | [1991/40] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 26.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2080569 ; | [X]FR2252419 (BALZERS PATENT BETEILIG AG [LI]); | [A]EP0291690 (LEYBOLD AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 270 (C-727)(4213) June 12, 1990.: & JP-A-2 080 569 (HITACHI LTD ) March 20, 1990, & JP2080569 A 00000000 | Examination | US3915117 | EP0312694 | JPH01237493 | EP0354294 | EP0443049 |