Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.1993 [1993/35] |
11.05.1992 | Publication of search report | published on 01.07.1992 [1992/27] |
23.08.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.10.1991 [1991/41] |