EP0450520 - Lottery terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.1993 [1993/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ganot, Zvi 37 Ha'gefen Street Omer / IL | [1991/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/41] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91105017.7 | 28.03.1991 | [1991/41] | Priority number, date | IL19440000939 | 29.03.1990 Original published format: IL 93944 | [1991/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0450520 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0450520 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A63F3/06, A63F3/08, G07F7/00, G07F17/32 | [1992/27] | CPC: |
A63F3/081 (EP);
G07C15/00 (EP);
G07F17/32 (EP);
G07F17/3251 (EP);
A63F2003/086 (EP);
A63F2009/242 (EP);
A63F2009/2429 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1991/41] | A63F3/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/41] | Title | German: | Lotterieterminal | [1991/41] | English: | Lottery terminal | [1991/41] | French: | Terminal de lotterie | [1991/41] | File destroyed: | 14.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 02.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/35] | 06.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.02.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]GB2148135 (IGT RENO NEV); | [A]GB2166961 (MARTIN BARRY); | [A]WO8604826 (ACORN IND INC [US]); | [A]GB2180460 (MAJSA MAT AUX JUEGO SA); | [A]US4764666 (BERGERON DANIEL R [US]); | [Y]WO8902139 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) |