EP0492036 - Glass fiber-reinforced fluoropolymer compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Banerjee, Shoibal 2404 Creekside Drive Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [1992/27] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91105018.5 | 28.03.1991 | [1992/27] | Priority number, date | US19900627510 | 20.12.1990 Original published format: US 627510 | [1992/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0492036 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0492036 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08K7/14, C03C25/02, C08K5/54, C08J5/08, C08K9/08 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
C08K9/08 (EP);
C03C25/305 (EP);
B29K2105/12 (EP);
B29K2105/251 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K9/08, C08L27/12 (EP);
C08K9/08, C08L45/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [1992/27] | C08K7/14, C03C25/02, C08K5/54, C08J5/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [1992/27] | Title | German: | Glasfaserverstärkte Fluorpolymer Zusammensetzungen | [1992/27] | English: | Glass fiber-reinforced fluoropolymer compositions | [1992/27] | French: | Compositions de polymères fluorés renforcés avec des fibres de verre | [1992/27] | File destroyed: | 31.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 15.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/38] | 27.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.02.1994 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2118920 ; | [A]EP0227103 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]); | [A]EP0318862 (NITTO BOSEKI CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0114092 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) |