EP0453819 - Method for producing micro fibre fleeces from thermoplastic polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nyssen, Peter Roger, Dipl.-Ing. Magnolienstrasse 6 W-4047 Dormagen 11 / DE | 02 /
Berkenhaus, Dirk, Dipl.-Ing. Urftstrasse 31 W-5000 Köln 50 / DE | 03 /
van Pey, Hans-Theo Am Pützbach 11 W-5152 Lipp / DE | [1991/44] | Application number, filing date | 91105117.5 | 30.03.1991 | [1991/44] | Priority number, date | DE19904011883 | 12.04.1990 Original published format: DE 4011883 | [1991/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0453819 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0453819 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/18, D04H1/56 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
D01D5/18 (EP,US);
D04H1/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1991/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Feinstfaservliesen aus thermoplastischen Polymeren | [1991/44] | English: | Method for producing micro fibre fleeces from thermoplastic polymers | [1991/44] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de nappes de fibres très fines de polymères thermoplastiques | [1991/44] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 20.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/12] | 30.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0325116 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]GB2093400 (PETRO FIBER OLJESANERING AB); | [A]EP0322136 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) |