EP0450562 - Nitride products and method and apparatus for producing nitride products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phillips Petroleum Company 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | For all designated states PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carter, Michael Curtis 5255 Nowata Road 202 Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US | 02 /
Gerhold, Bruce William P.O. Box 227 Bartlesville, OK 74005 / US | [1991/41] | Representative(s) | Geissler, Bernhard, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | Geissler, Bernhard, Dr. jur., Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91105174.6 | 02.04.1991 | [1991/41] | Priority number, date | US19900504154 | 03.04.1990 Original published format: US 504154 | [1991/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0450562 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0450562 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0450562 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C01B21/06, C01B21/068, B01J12/02 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
C01B21/06 (EP,KR,US);
B01J12/02 (EP,US);
B01J19/26 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01B21/068 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/00063 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0009 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00094 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00119 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00132 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00155 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00159 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00162 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00164 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00184 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00252 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1991/41] | C01B21/06, B01J12/02, B01J19/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/41] | Title | German: | Nitridprodukte und Verfahren un Apparat zur Herstellung von Nitridprodukten | [1991/41] | English: | Nitride products and method and apparatus for producing nitride products | [1991/41] | French: | Produits en nitrure et procédé et appareil pour la production des produits en nitrure | [1991/41] | Examination procedure | 10.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 30.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0063272 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0171316 (RHONE POULENC CHIM BASE [FR]); | [A]EP0313980 (AEROCHEM RES LAB [US]) |