EP0469235 - Tree treatment capsule with radially expanding shank portion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1998 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLEAN INJECTION SYSTEM CIS AB Kungsgatan 18 S-632 21 Eskilstuna / SE | [1992/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merving, Hans A. K. August Stalbergsvag 10A S-644 00 Torshalla / SE | [1992/06] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91105186.0 | 02.04.1991 | [1992/06] | Priority number, date | US19900559938 | 30.07.1990 Original published format: US 559938 | [1992/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0469235 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0469235 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0469235 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A01G7/06 | [1992/06] | CPC: |
A01G7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1992/06] | Title | German: | Kapsel mit sich radial ausbreitendem Schaft zur Behandlung von Bäumen | [1992/06] | English: | Tree treatment capsule with radially expanding shank portion | [1992/06] | French: | Capsule pour le traitement des arbres avec une tige expansible radialement | [1992/06] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/25] | 19.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1995 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.01.1998 | CH | 14.01.1998 | ES | 14.01.1998 | IT | 14.01.1998 | LI | 14.01.1998 | DK | 14.04.1998 | [2008/02] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 14.01.1998 | |
CH | 14.01.1998 | ||
ES | 14.01.1998 | ||
IT | 14.01.1998 | ||
LI | 14.01.1998 | ||
DK | 14.04.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 14.01.1998 | |
CH | 14.01.1998 | ||
ES | 14.01.1998 | ||
IT | 14.01.1998 | ||
LI | 14.01.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 14.01.1998 | |
CH | 14.01.1998 | ||
IT | 14.01.1998 | ||
LI | 14.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/43] | AT | 14.01.1998 | |
CH | 14.01.1998 | ||
LI | 14.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/40] | AT | 14.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4308689 (JENSON CLARK E, et al) [A] 1,7,9* abstract *; | [DA]US4905410 (MERVING HANS [SE]) [DA] 1,7,9 * column 2, line 25 - line 65; figure - * |