EP0457016 - Grinding machine involving a grinding unit comprising one or more spindles disposed on a machine bed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.1995 [1995/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buderus Schleiftechnik GmbH Postfach 11 10, Industriestrasse 3 D-35607 Asslar / DE | [1991/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leidecker, Manfred Dörrstück 6 W-6334 Asslar / DE | [1991/47] | Application number, filing date | 91105464.1 | 06.04.1991 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | DE19904015554 | 15.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4015554 | [1991/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0457016 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0457016 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B24B5/06, B24B51/00 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
B24B41/002 (EP);
B24B27/0061 (EP);
B24B41/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/47] | Title | German: | Schleifmaschine mit einer auf dem Maschinenbett angeordneten Schleifeinheit für eine oder mehrere Schleifspindeln | [1991/47] | English: | Grinding machine involving a grinding unit comprising one or more spindles disposed on a machine bed | [1991/47] | French: | Machine de meulage comportant une unité de meulage impliquant l'emploi d'une ou plusieurs broches disposée sur un banc de machines | [1991/47] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 19.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 10.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/33] | Request for further processing for: | 10.02.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.03.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.06.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE820519 (LORENZ C AG); | [X]US3924355 (TATSUMI YOUJI, et al); | [Y]FR2275281 (GERINTE NOELLE [FR]); | [YD]DE2907282 (REICHMANN & SOHN ELMASCH FABRI) |