EP0455995 - Device for homogenizing semi-liquid manure in a manure pit with the form of a channel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Dissel Beheer B.V. Dinxperlosestraatweg 88 NL-7122 AA Aalten / NL | [1991/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ansink, J.C. Dinxperlosestraatweg 143 NL-7122 AA Aalten / NL | [1993/31] |
Former [1991/46] | 01 /
Ansink, J.C. Dinxperlosestraatweg 143 NL-7122 AA Aalten / NL | Representative(s) | Schulze Horn, Stefan Goldstrasse 50 48147 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | Schulze Horn, Stefan, Dipl.-Ing. M.Sc. Goldstrasse 50 D-48147 Münster / DE | ||
Former [1991/46] | Patentanwälte Schulze Horn und Hoffmeister Goldstrasse 36 D-48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 91105568.9 | 09.04.1991 | [1991/46] | Priority number, date | DE19900005160U | 07.05.1990 Original published format: DE 9005160 U | [1991/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0455995 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0455995 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0455995 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/01 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
A01C3/026 (EP);
B01F27/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, LU, NL [1991/46] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Homogenisieren von Gülle in einem in Form eines Kanals angelegten Güllekeller | [1991/46] | English: | Device for homogenizing semi-liquid manure in a manure pit with the form of a channel | [1991/46] | French: | Dispositif pour homogénéiser le fumier dans une fosse à lisier en forme de canal | [1991/46] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 02.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 03.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.04.1994 | [2000/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3839599 ; | [A]EP0155842 (IJIJI SHUGEIZO CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US3155375 (VAUGHAN JAMES E) |