EP0469236 - Apparatus for ion-plasma machining workpiece surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1996 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAUZER HOLDING B.V. Groethofstraat 27 NL-5916 PA Venlo / NL | [1992/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vladimirovich, Danysh Sergey 3rd Podbelskiy proezd, 16, flat 15 107150 Moscow / SU | 02 /
Ivanovna, Kolosova Galina Svoboda ulitza, 63, flat 274 12364 Moscow / SU | 03 /
Nickolaevich, Lobanov Alexey Stremyanniy pereulok, 33, flat 15 113093 Moscow / SU | 04 /
Vladimirovich, Obukhov Andrey Bolotnikovskay ulitza, 30, flat 18 113149 Moscow / SU | 05 /
Alexeevich, Obukhov Vladimir Petrozavodskay ulitza, 17, flat 164 125502 Moscow / SU | 06 /
Igorevich, Yurchenko Alexandr Obrucheva ulitza, 16, flat 100 117421 Moscow / SU | [1992/06] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/35] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys.) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/06] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91105592.9 | 09.04.1991 | [1992/06] | Priority number, date | SU19904855467 | 30.07.1990 Original published format: SU 4855467 | [1992/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0469236 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0469236 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0469236 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/30, H01J37/08 | [1993/16] | CPC: |
H01J37/3007 (EP);
H01J37/3053 (EP);
H01J2237/0475 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/06] | H01J37/08 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/13] |
Former [1992/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Plasmastrahlbearbeiten von Werkstückoberflächen | [1992/06] | English: | Apparatus for ion-plasma machining workpiece surfaces | [1992/06] | French: | Appareil pour usiner des surfaces de pièces à travailler par jet de plasma | [1992/06] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, GR, LU | 19.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/51] | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.09.1991 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.1991 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.1991 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.1991 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.1991 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.1991 | LU   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 09.04.1996 | SE | 10.04.1996 | CH | 30.04.1996 | LI | 30.04.1996 | [1998/04] |
Former [1997/17] | GB | 09.04.1996 | |
SE | 10.04.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2156578 ; | [AD]EP0021140 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, E field, vol. 14, no. 161, March 28, 1990 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 141 E 909 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, E field, vol. 13, no. 5, January 9, 1989 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 53 E 701 |