EP0458050 - Hydrostatic-mechanical drive with optimised energy consumption for auxiliaries of a motor vehicle with power steering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 80976 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 D-80976 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagin, Faust, Dipl.-Ing. Poccistrasse 2 W-8000 München 2 / DE | 02 /
Drewitz, Hans, Ing.-(grad.) Agnesstrasse 59 W-8000 München 40 / DE | [1991/48] | Application number, filing date | 91105733.9 | 11.04.1991 | [1991/48] | Priority number, date | DE19904015374 | 12.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4015374 | DE19904017095 | 28.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4017095 | [1991/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0458050 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0458050 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/07, B60K25/00 | [1991/48] | CPC: |
B60K25/00 (EP);
B62D5/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [1991/48] | Title | German: | Bedarfsoptimierter hydrostatischmechanischer Antrieb von Nebenaggregaten eines Kraftfahrzeuges mit Servolenkung | [1991/48] | English: | Hydrostatic-mechanical drive with optimised energy consumption for auxiliaries of a motor vehicle with power steering | [1991/48] | French: | Entraînement hydrostatique-mécanique à consommation d'énergie optimisée pour les appareils auxiliaires d'un véhicule à moteur à direction assistée | [1991/48] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 10.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2456007 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]); | [X]FR1354687 (JARMUEFEJLESZTESI INTEZET); | [X]US4189919 (GOSCENSKI EDWARD J JR [US]); | [A]GB818797 (BORG WARNER); | [A]DE3529743 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]FR1539130 (CITROEN SA ANDRE); | [A]EP0052527 (VALEO [FR]); | [A]FR1463799 (DBA SA) |