EP0483448 - Load control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VDO Adolf Schindling AG Gräfstrasse 103 D-60487 Frankfurt / DE | [1992/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hickmann, Gerd Kirchgasse 3 W-6231 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE | 02 /
Pfalzgraf, Manfred Luisenstrasse 24 W-6000 Frankfurt/Main / DE | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Klein, Thomas Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Sodener Strasse 9 D-65824 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE | Application number, filing date | 91105822.0 | 12.04.1991 | [1992/19] | Priority number, date | DE19904034575 | 31.10.1990 Original published format: DE 4034575 | [1992/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0483448 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0483448 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F02D11/10, B60K26/04 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
B60K26/04 (EP,US);
F02D11/10 (EP,US);
F02D2011/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/19] | Title | German: | Lastverstelleinrichtung | [1992/19] | English: | Load control apparatus | [1992/19] | French: | Dispositif de réglage de charge | [1992/19] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/19] | 03.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 03.08.1994 | GB | 03.08.1994 | IT | 03.08.1994 | SE | 03.11.1994 | [2002/25] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 03.08.1994 | |
IT | 03.08.1994 | ||
SE | 03.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/37] | GB | 03.08.1994 | |
SE | 03.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | SE | 03.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0300153 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]); | [Y]EP0389649 (AUDI AG [DE]); | [AP]EP0412237 (AUDI AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0378737 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) |