Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.1996 [1996/10] |
27.01.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] |
13.06.1994 | First examination report | |
12.03.1993 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] |
28.01.1993 | Publication of search report | published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] |
07.09.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] |