Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0452833 | Global Dossier | 15.03.1995 | B1 | EP0452833 | 17.03.1993 | A3 | EP0452833 | 23.10.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US51169790 | 20.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59104926D1 | 20.04.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US51169790 | 20.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5011465 | 30.04.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US51169790 | 20.04.1990 |