EP0452833 - Multiple-step gearbox [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.1996 [1996/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeffries, Dennis Lee 9842 Dysart Road Waterloo, Iowa 50704 / US | 02 /
Marquart, Gordon LeRoy 1174 Ainsworth Street Jessup, Iowa 50648 / US | 03 /
Mattson, Timothy John 5010 Dawnview Terrace Golden Valley, Minnesota 55422 / US | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department D-68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 91105909.5 | 13.04.1991 | [1991/43] | Priority number, date | US19900511697 | 20.04.1990 Original published format: US 511697 | [1991/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0452833 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0452833 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0452833 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/66 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
F16H3/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/43] | Title | German: | Mehrstufiges Fahrzeuggetriebe | [1991/43] | English: | Multiple-step gearbox | [1991/43] | French: | Boîte de vitesses à plusieures étages | [1991/43] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/18] | 16.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0036656 (DEERE & CO [US]); | [A]US3290962 (MCCANN WALTER L, et al) |