EP0459121 - Sliding guide for handheld machine tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kleider, Albert Zirbelweg 34 W-7170 Schwaebisch Hall / DE | [1991/49] | Application number, filing date | 91105928.5 | 13.04.1991 | [1991/49] | Priority number, date | DE19904017405 | 30.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4017405 | [1991/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0459121 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0459121 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0459121 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/06, B27B9/04, B24B55/04, B24B23/02 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
B23Q11/06 (EP);
B23D45/16 (EP);
B23Q1/0063 (EP);
B27G19/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/49] | B23Q11/06, B24B23/02, B27B9/04 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/49] | Title | German: | Führungsschlitten für eine handgeführte Werkzeugmaschine | [1991/49] | English: | Sliding guide for handheld machine tool | [1991/49] | French: | Sabot de guidage pour machine portative | [1991/49] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/03] | 10.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8437711U ; | [A]US1900553 (HAMPTON GEORGE E); | [A]DE2359714 (ACKERMANN & SCHMITT KG); | [A]US3730239 (KAMAN F, et al); | [AD]DE8308464U |