EP0455035 - Light source provided with light reflecting means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TUNGSRAM Részvénytársaság Váci ut. 77 H-1340 Budapest IV / HU | [1991/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Losonczi, Zoltán Kárpát u. 52/b H-1133 Budapest / HU | 02 /
Szabo, György Bajza u. 5 H-1046 Budapest / HU | [1991/45] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/45] | Patentanwälte Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 D-80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91105982.2 | 15.04.1991 | [1991/45] | Priority number, date | HU19900002623 | 28.04.1990 Original published format: HU 262390 | [1991/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0455035 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0455035 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F21V19/00, F21V17/04 | [1991/45] | CPC: |
F21V17/04 (EP,US);
F21V19/0005 (EP,US);
H01K1/32 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/45] | Title | German: | Lichtquelle mit Reflektor | [1991/45] | English: | Light source provided with light reflecting means | [1991/45] | French: | Source lumineuse avec réflecteur | [1991/45] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 05.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/40] | 28.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/36] | 07.04.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4219870 (HARADEN THOMAS [US], et al); | [A]FR2176898 (LUCAS ELECTRICAL CO LTD [GB]); | [A]US4843276 (JACROT MICHEL [FR]); | [A]EP0075304 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) |