EP0452932 - Warp mending operation control method and apparatus for carrying out the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.1997 [1997/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tsudakoma Corporation 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa-ken 921 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states Tsudakoma Corporation 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa-ken 921 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takegawa, Yujiro 1-378, Aza-tsurugaoka 4-chome, Uchinadamachi Kahoku-gun, Ishikawa-ken 920-02 / JP | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91106234.7 | 18.04.1991 | [1991/43] | Priority number, date | JP19900104282 | 19.04.1990 Original published format: JP 10428290 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0452932 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0452932 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D03J1/00 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
D03J1/00 (EP,US);
D03D51/00 (KR);
D03J1/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überwachung der Reparatur von gebrochenen Kettfäden | [1991/43] | English: | Warp mending operation control method and apparatus for carrying out the same | [1991/43] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de contrôle pour la réparation des fils de chaîne | [1991/43] | Examination procedure | 26.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/24] | 05.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0310154 (PICANOL NV [BE]); | [A]EP0318047 (TSUDAKOMA IND CO LTD [JP]) |