EP0456018 - Powder coatings of vinylidene fluoride/hexafluoropropylene copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 13.12.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.1996 | Opposition rejected | published on 29.01.1997 [1997/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102-3222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102-3222 / US | ||
Former [1991/46] | For all designated states ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. Three Parkway Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Polek, Michael David 922 W. Main Street Norristown, Pennsylvania 19401 / US | [1991/46] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91106260.2 | 18.04.1991 | [1991/46] | Priority number, date | US19900521792 | 10.05.1990 Original published format: US 521792 | [1991/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0456018 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0456018 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/03, C09D127/12, // (C09D127/12, 133:00) | [1991/46] | CPC: |
C09D127/12 (EP,US);
C09D133/06 (EP,US);
C08L27/12 (EP,US);
C08L33/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D127/12, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C09D133/06, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/46] | Title | German: | Pulverbeschichtungen aus Vinylidenfluorid/Hexafluoropropylen-Copolymeren | [1991/46] | English: | Powder coatings of vinylidene fluoride/hexafluoropropylene copolymers | [1991/46] | French: | Compositions de revêtement en poudre à base de copolymères de vinylidène fluorure/hexafluoropropylène | [1991/46] | Examination procedure | 03.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/10] | 23.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.03.1994
20.04.1994
ADMISSIBLE FINA Research Zone industrielle C B- 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | [1994/19] | 25.04.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.07.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.02.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.02.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.09.1996 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 14.09.1996 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1997/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0284996 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]); | [XD]US4770939 (SIETSES WILLEM [NL], et al) |