EP0453966 - Ferroelectric liquid crystal display with high contrast and high brightness [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.1998 [1998/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dübal, Hans-Rolf, Dr. Heuhohlweg 6 W-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | 02 /
Harada, Takamasa 4-35-15, Kikari, Inzai-machi Inbagun, Chiba / JP | 03 /
Rieger, Heinz, Dr. Am Kreishaus 2 W-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | 04 /
Rösch, Norbert, Dr. Geisenheimer Strasse 95 W-6000 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 05 /
Wegener, Peter, Dr. Am Eichkopf 4 W-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | [1991/44] | Application number, filing date | 91106265.1 | 18.04.1991 | [1991/44] | Priority number, date | DE19904012750 | 21.04.1990 Original published format: DE 4012750 | [1991/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0453966 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0453966 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0453966 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1337 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
G02F1/133719 (EP,US);
G02F1/1333 (KR);
C09K19/3458 (EP,US);
C09K19/3463 (EP,US);
C09K2323/025 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31721 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/09] |
Former [1991/44] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Ferroelektrisches Flüssigkristalldisplay mit hohem Kontrast und hoher Helligkeit | [1991/44] | English: | Ferroelectric liquid crystal display with high contrast and high brightness | [1991/44] | French: | Afficheur à cristal liquide ferroélectrique à contraste élevé et à haute luminosité | [1991/44] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/40] | 07.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/07] | Request for further processing for: | 25.01.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP54091253 ; | [Y]JP62237431 ; | [Y]JP62211617 ; | [Y]JP60097324 ; | [A]FR2240763 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [Y]FR2332550 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [A]EP0362861 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 3, no. 113 (E-139)19. September 1979 & JP-A-54 091 253 ( TOSHIBA ) 19. Juli 1979, & JP54091253 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 104 (P-685)6. April 1988 & JP-A-62 237 431 ( CANON ) 17. Oktober 1987, & JP62237431 A 00000000 | [Y] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Week 8743, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 87-302394/ 43 & JP-A-62 211 617 (SEIKO DENSHI) 17. September 1987, & JP62211617 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 246 (P-393)(1969) 3. Oktober 1985 & JP-A-60 097 324 ( SHARP ) 31. Mai 1985, & JP60097324 A 00000000 | Examination | - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, Band 28, Nr. 3, März 1989, Seiten L483-L486; Y. SATO et al.: "High Quality Ferroelectric Liquid Crystal Display with Quasi-Bookshelf Layer Structure" |