EP0457052 - Passively addressed high resolution liquid crystal display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.1993 [1993/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia (Deutschland) GmbH Östliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 132 75175 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states Nokia (Deutschland) GmbH Östliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 132 D-75175 Pforzheim / DE | ||
Former [1991/47] | For all designated states Nokia Unterhaltungselektronik (Deutschland) GmbH Östliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 132 D-7530 Pforzheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brosig, Stefan, Dr. Teckstrasse 51 B W-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | [1991/47] | Application number, filing date | 91106297.4 | 19.04.1991 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | DE19904015869 | 17.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4015869 | [1991/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0457052 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0457052 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1337 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
G02F1/133345 (EP,US);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G02F1/133711 (EP,US);
C09K2323/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31544 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/47] | Title | German: | Hochauflösende passiv angesteuerte Flüssigkristallanzeige | [1991/47] | English: | Passively addressed high resolution liquid crystal display | [1991/47] | French: | Afficheur à cristal liquide à haute résolution à commande passive | [1991/47] | File destroyed: | 14.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 09.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/40] | 11.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0363908 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]JPS6262332 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11no. 256 (P-607)20. August 1987 & JP-A-62 062 332 ( SUMITOMO ) 19. März 1987 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. Bd. 16, Nr. 9, Februar 1974NEW YORK US Seiten 3077 - 3078; R.F.BUSH ET AL.: 'Fluocarbon Surface Aligning Agents for Nematic Liquids' |