EP0454077 - Guide for bars of an espagnolette [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ramsauer, Dieter Am Neuhauskothen 20 D-42555 Velbert / DE | [1991/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/44] | Representative(s) | Stratmann, Ernst Strücker Weg 14 40699 Erkrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | Stratmann, Ernst, Dr.-Ing. Schadowplatz 9 D-40212 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 91106573.8 | 24.04.1991 | [1991/44] | Priority number, date | DE19900004757U | 27.04.1990 Original published format: DE 9004757 U | [1991/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0454077 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0454077 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0454077 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/22 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
E05C9/22 (EP);
E05B63/0056 (EP);
E05B15/1607 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/44] | Title | German: | Stangenführung für die Stange eines Stangenverschlusses | [1991/44] | English: | Guide for bars of an espagnolette | [1991/44] | French: | Moyens de guidages pour les barres d'une espagnolette | [1991/44] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 22.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.11.1994 | GB | 30.11.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/44] | GB | 30.11.1994 | |
FR | 28.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/41] | FR | 28.04.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2273967 (ITW DE FRANCE [FR]); | [AD]DE7621270U ; | [A]FR2375414 (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]); | [A]GB2020731 (SPRINGFIX BEFESTIGUNGSTECHNIK); | [AD]EP0035175 (RUNGE FRIEDHELM [DE], et al) |