EP0454093 - Spindle apparatus for supporting and rotating a workpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.12.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYODA KOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | For all designated states TOYODA KOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuchiya, Yukiharu 9-12, 1-chome, Haruoka, Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Maruyama, Toshio 1815, Minamimikomi, Miwa Miwa, Ibi-cho, Ibi-gun, Gifu-ken / JP | 03 /
Oishi, Kenzaburo 38, Shinmachimae, Hitotsugi-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Yamaguchi, Masakazu 9-488, Gonbeidani, Okehazama, Arimatsu-cho Midori-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Sano, Shoichi 26, Yonpo, Miya-cho Gamagouri-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 06 /
Nonoyama, Makoto 2-52, Shintomi-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1991/46] |
Former [1991/44] | 01 /
Tsuchiya, Yukiharu 9-12, 1-chome, Haruoka, Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Maruyama, Toshio 2-63, Inaba-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Oishi, Kenzaburo 38, Shinmachimae, Hitotsugi-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Yamaguchi, Masakazu 9-488, Gonbeidani, Okehazama, Arimatsu-cho Midori-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Sano, Shoichi 26, Yonpo, Miya-cho Gamagouri-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Nonoyama, Makoto 2-52, Shintomi-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91106609.0 | 24.04.1991 | [1991/44] | Priority number, date | JP19900110254 | 27.04.1990 Original published format: JP 11025490 | [1991/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0454093 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0454093 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B24B5/04, B24B19/12, B24B41/06 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
B24B19/12 (EP,US);
B24B41/06 (KR);
B24B41/061 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/44] | B24B41/06, B24B19/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/44] | Title | German: | Spindelausführung zur Halterung und Drehung eines Werkstückes | [1991/44] | English: | Spindle apparatus for supporting and rotating a workpiece | [1991/44] | French: | Disposition de broche pour le soutien et la mise en rotation d'une pièce | [1991/44] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 14.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/04] | 05.09.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3653854 (ASANO KIROAKI); | [X]DD277421 (WERKZEUGMASCH OKT VEB [DD]); | [A]DE2202805 (LITTON INDUSTRIES INC) |