EP0463316 - Self-adjusting impedance matching driver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biber, Alice Irene 120 Stratford Road Needham, Massachusetts 02192 / US | 02 /
Stout, Douglas Willard 38 Sheldon Road Milton, Vermont 05468 / US | [1992/01] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1992/01] | Klocke, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91106666.0 | 25.04.1991 | [1992/01] | Priority number, date | US19900534406 | 07.06.1990 Original published format: US 534406 | [1992/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0463316 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0463316 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40, H04B3/36, H04B3/50, G06F13/36 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
H04L25/028 (EP,US);
H03K19/0005 (EP,US);
H04B3/00 (EP,US);
H04L12/40 (EP,US);
H04L12/40039 (EP,US);
H04L25/0278 (EP,US);
H04L25/03019 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/01] | Title | German: | Selbsteinstellender Treiber für Impedanzanpassung | [1992/01] | English: | Self-adjusting impedance matching driver | [1992/01] | French: | Etage d'attaque auto-ajustable pour adaptation d'impédance | [1992/01] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 14.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4912724 (WILSON TERRY O [CA]); | [A]DE2537383 ; | [A]EP0364700 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]); | [A]EP0323586 (GTE LABORATORIES INC [US]) | Examination | EP0410402 | EP0254011 | - IEEE Journal of Solid-State Circuits Vol. 23, No.2. April 1988, New York US, pages 457-464, T.F. Knight "A SELF-TERMINATING LOW-VOLTAGE SWING CMOS OUTPUT DRIVER" | - Patent Abstracts of Japan, Vol. 014, No. 142 (E-904), 16. March 1990, NEC IC MICROCOMPUT. SYST. LTD |