EP0455192 - Microvoided supports for receiving element used in thermal dye transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/45] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harrison, Daniel J., c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Lee, Jong, S., c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Maier, Larry K., c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US | [1991/45] | Representative(s) | Brandes, Jürgen, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/45] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr. rer. nat., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91106909.4 | 29.04.1991 | [1991/45] | Priority number, date | US19900516616 | 30.04.1990 Original published format: US 516616 | [1991/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0455192 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0455192 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00, B41M1/30 | [1991/45] | CPC: |
B41M5/41 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/15] |
Former [1991/45] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Mikroporen aufweisende Träger für Empfangselement das bei der thermischen Farbstoffübertragung verwendet wird | [1991/45] | English: | Microvoided supports for receiving element used in thermal dye transfer | [1991/45] | French: | Supports à micro cavités comme élément récepteur dans le transfert thermique de colorants | [1991/45] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 09.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4770931 ; | [AD]EP0322771 ; | [AD]EP0234563 ; | [XP]US4994312 ; | [XE]EP0436178 |