EP0456075 - Positive-working radiation-sensitive mixture and radiation-sensitive recording material for exposure using deep UV-radiation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Röschert, Horst, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Am Pfingstborn 16 W-6531 Ober-Hilbersheim / DE | 02 /
Pawlowski, Georg, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Fritz-Kalle-Strasse 34 W-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | 03 /
Merrem, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. 47 Addison-Drive Basking Ridge, N.J. 07920 / US | 04 /
Dammel, Ralph, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Im Quellborn 16 W-6501 Klein-Winternheim / DE | 05 /
Spiess, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Rheingaustrasse 20 W-6110 Dieburg / DE | [1991/46] | Application number, filing date | 91106920.1 | 29.04.1991 | [1991/46] | Priority number, date | DE19904014648 | 08.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4014648 | [1991/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0456075 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0456075 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/004 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
G03F7/0163 (EP,US);
G03F7/16 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/18] |
Former [1991/46] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Positiv arbeitendes strahlungsempfindliches Gemisch und strahlungsempfindliches Aufzeichnungsmaterial für die Belichtung mit DUV-Strahlung | [1991/46] | English: | Positive-working radiation-sensitive mixture and radiation-sensitive recording material for exposure using deep UV-radiation | [1991/46] | French: | Composition sensible aux rayonnements à effet positif et matériel d'enregistrement sensible aux rayonnements UV profonds | [1996/37] |
Former [1991/46] | Composition sensible aux rayonnements à effet positif et matériel d'enregistrement sensibles aux rayonnements lourdes expositions aux rayonnements UV profonds | Examination procedure | 17.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 25.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP01188852 ; | [AP]EP0378067 (HOECHST AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 478 (P-951)(3826) 30 Oktober 1989, & JP-A-01 188852 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) 28 Juli 1989,, & JP01188852 A 00000000 |