Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] |
26.07.1996 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.1996 [1996/37] |
02.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
10.05.1996 | Renewal fee | |
15.03.1996 | Change - designated states | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] |
12.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
19.07.1995 | First examination report | |
27.02.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.04.1992 [1992/16] |
27.09.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.11.1991 [1991/46] |