Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH04226456 | Global Dossier | 17.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4014648 | 08.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0456075 | Global Dossier | 11.09.1996 | B1 | EP0456075 | 13.11.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4014648 | 08.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4014648 | 14.11.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4014648 | 08.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59108159D1 | 17.10.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4014648 | 08.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR910020492 | 20.12.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4014648 | 08.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5256517 | 26.10.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4014648 | 08.05.1990 |