blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0456113

EP0456113 - Glass containers internally coated with a silicone and having an in situ freeze-dried solid product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  13.07.2001
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHWARZ PHARMA AG
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10
40789 Monheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/46]For all designated states
SCHWARZ PHARMA AG
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10
D-40789 Monheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klokkers-Bethke, Karin, Dr.
Görlitzer Strasse 16
D-63322 Rödermark / DE
02 / Fischer, Wilfried, Dr.
Anemonenweg 16
D-51399 Burscheid / DE
[1995/29]
Former [1991/46]01 / Klokkers-Bethke, Karin, Dr.
Görlitzer Strasse 16
W-6074 Rödermark / DE
02 / Fischer, Wilfried, Dr.
Anemonenweg 16
W-5093 Burscheid / DE
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/46]Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date91107100.902.05.1991
[1991/46]
Priority number, dateDE1990401466508.05.1990         Original published format: DE 4014665
[1991/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0456113
Date:13.11.1991
Language:DE
[1991/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0456113
Date:25.11.1992
Language:DE
[1992/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0456113
Date:19.07.1995
Language:DE
[1995/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.1992
ClassificationIPC:B65D23/02
[1991/46]
CPC:
A61J1/06 (EP,US); B65D23/02 (EP,US); Y10T428/1321 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31612 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/46]
TitleGerman:Oberflächenvergütete Gläser in Primärpackmitteln von Lyophilisaten[1991/46]
English:Glass containers internally coated with a silicone and having an in situ freeze-dried solid product[1991/46]
French:Emballage de verre interne enduite de silicone contenant un produit lyophilisé[1991/46]
Examination procedure08.05.1991Examination requested  [1991/46]
23.02.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.11.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.1995Fee for grant paid
03.02.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.04.1996  29.04.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal Aktiengesellschaft
Industriestr. 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Beszédes, Stephan G.
Patentanwalt
Postfach 11 68
85201 Dachau / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1996/24]
Opponent(s)01  19.04.1996  29.04.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal Aktiengesellschaft
Industriestr. 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Beszédes, Stephan G.
Patentanwalt Postfach 11 68
85201 Dachau / DE
22.05.1996Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.11.1996Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
13.08.1997Reply to a communication from the opposition division
16.06.1998Date of oral proceedings
29.06.1998Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.06.1998Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
22.05.2001Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/35]
Appeal following opposition27.08.1998Appeal received No.  T0856/98
29.10.1998Statement of grounds filed
22.05.2001Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
22.05.2001Date of oral proceedings
07.06.2001Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JP54097617  ;
 [AD]US2504482  (ROBERT GOLDMAN)
 [X]  - WORLD PATENTS INDEX Week 7937, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 79-66884B & JP-A-54 097 617 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL IND KK) 1. August 1979, & JP54097617 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.