EP0456194 - Tertiary amine catalysts for polyurethanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.05.1994 [1994/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [1991/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casey, Jeremiah Patrick 2665 Arbor Circle Emmaus, PA 18049 / US | 02 /
Carr, Richard van Court 416 South 26th Street Allentown, PA 18104 / US | 03 /
Wasilczyk, George James 1420 Keystone Road Allentown, PA 18103 / US | 04 /
Petrella, Robert Gabriel 624 Elm Road Allentown, PA 18104 / US | [1991/46] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91107416.9 | 07.05.1991 | [1991/46] | Priority number, date | US19900519711 | 07.05.1990 Original published format: US 519711 | [1991/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0456194 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0456194 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/18, C08G18/20, C07C217/08, C07D295/088, B01J31/02 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
C07D295/088 (EP,US);
C08F4/00 (KR);
C07C217/08 (EP,US);
C08G18/18 (KR);
C08G18/1825 (EP,US);
C08G18/1833 (EP,US);
C08G18/2009 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/46] | Title | German: | Tertiäre Amine-Katalysatoren für Polyurethane | [1991/46] | English: | Tertiary amine catalysts for polyurethanes | [1991/46] | French: | Catalyseurs d'amines tertiaires pour polyuréthanes | [1991/46] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 17.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 26.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0137182 (BAYER AG [DE]) |